EP0590530 - Fusion proteins for prodrug-activation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/17] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehrmann, Mathias Wingertstrasse 11 D-35457 Lollar / DE | 02 /
Seemann, Gerhard Weissdornweg 32 D-35041 Marburg / DE | 03 /
Bosslet, Klaus An der Haustatt 64 D-35037 Marburg / DE | 04 /
Czech, Jörg Höhenweg 3 D-35041 Marburg / DE | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebaüde K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115418.1 | 24.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | DE19924233152 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233152 | [1994/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590530 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590530 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590530 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C07K14/00, C12N9/00, C12N15/81, A01K67/027, A61K38/00, G01N33/68, C12N1/21, C12N5/10 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01031 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K47/65 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/2402 (KR);
C12N9/2434 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (KR);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | C12N15/62, C07K15/28, C12N9/00, C12N15/81, A01K67/027, A61K37/02, G01N33/68, C12N1/21, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Fusionsproteine zur Prodrug-Aktivierung | [1994/14] | English: | Fusion proteins for prodrug-activation | [1994/14] | French: | Protéines de fusion pour l'activation de pro-médicaments | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 09.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Astrazeneca UK Limited Global Intellectual Property PO Box 272 Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB Opponent's representative Giles, Allen Frank AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE ASTRAZENECA UK Limited Global intellectual Property PO Box 272 Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB Opponent's representative Giles, Allen Frank AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 05.03.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.08.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/37] | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8910140 (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0501215 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A] - K.BOSSLET ET AL., "Molecular and functional characterisation of a fusion protein suited for tumour specific prodrug activation", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (199202), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 234 - 238, XP000612143 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - U.BRINKMANN ET AL., "Independent domain folding of Pseudomonas exotoxin and single-chain immunotoxins: Influence of interdomain connections", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (19920401), vol. 89, no. 7, pages 3075 - 3079, XP000264181 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.7.3075 |