Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0606532

EP0606532 - Silicone polyelectrolyte aqueous coating solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center Saint Paul
Minnesota 55144-1000 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center
Saint Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US
Former [1994/29]For all designated states
Shores, Andrew A.
212 Carroll Canal
Venice, CA 90291 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shores, A. Andrew
212 Carroll Canal
Venice, California 90291 / US
[1997/38]
Former [1994/29]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual
Property Counsel
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [1998/05]Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Laboratories (Europe) GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hansastrasse 9
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [1994/29]Hooper, John Peter Lindesay
5 Haslingfield Road
Harlton, Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB
Application number, filing date93115513.925.09.1993
[1994/29]
Priority number, dateUS1992099070914.12.1992         Original published format: US 990709
[1994/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0606532
Date:20.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0606532
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:C09D183/08, C08G77/38, C08G18/61, C08G18/08
[1994/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/13]
Former [1994/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wässrige Polysiloxanpolyelektrolyt-enthaltende Beschichtungszusammensetzung[1994/29]
English:Silicone polyelectrolyte aqueous coating solution[1994/29]
French:Solution de revêtement aqueuse contenant un polyélectrolyte à base d'un polysiloxane[1994/29]
Examination procedure26.10.1993Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.06.1994Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL
05.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/11]
29.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2001Fee for grant paid
08.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.01.1994AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1994
20.01.1994DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994ES   M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1994
20.01.1994FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1994
20.01.1994GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1994
20.01.1994GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1994
20.01.1994LI   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.01.1994SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199503   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.1995
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3730780  (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8,13-15 * claims 1-6,15 * * page 3, line 17 - line 25 * * page 4, line 28 - line 64 * * page 5, line 6 - line 17 *;
 [Y]CH476063  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8,13-15 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 14 - column 6, line 10 * * column 11, line 27 - line 51 *;
 [A]EP0342826  (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,15 * claims 1,4-6,9,10 * * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 32 - line 33 * * page 5, line 4 - line 20 *;
 [A]EP0380236  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,15 * claims 1,2,4,9,10 * * page 7, line 45 - line 56 * * page 9, line 8 - line 44 *;
 [A]EP0008090  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * page 6, line 5 - line 14 * * page 9, line 6 - line 24 * * page 13, line 8 - line 13 *