Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0591951

EP0591951 - Electrically conductive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8565 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]For all designated states
SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugimoto, Toshiya, c/o Sekisui Chem. Co. Ltd.
Chem. Res. Inst. of 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shima moto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP
02 / Suezaki, Minoru, c/o Sekisui Chem. Co. Ltd.
Chem. Res. Inst. of 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shima moto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP
03 / Shitiri, Tokushige, c/o Sekisui Chem. Co. Ltd.
Chem. Res. Inst. of 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shima moto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP
04 / Maruyama, Kouji, c/o Sekisui Chem. Co. Ltd.
Chem. Res. Inst. of 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shima moto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP
[1994/15]
Representative(s)ter Meer, Nicolaus
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date93116178.006.10.1993
[1994/15]
Priority number, dateJP1992026850907.10.1992         Original published format: JP 26850992
JP1993002886618.02.1993         Original published format: JP 2886693
JP1993005199112.03.1993         Original published format: JP 5199193
[1994/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0591951
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0591951
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:H01B1/12, C09D5/24
[1994/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/15]
TitleGerman:Elektrisch leitfähige Zusammensetzung[1994/15]
English:Electrically conductive composition[1994/15]
French:Composition électro-conductrice[1994/15]
Examination procedure28.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/39]
15.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
16.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
13.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH03137121  ;
 [AD]JPS6060166  ;
 [AD]US4983322  (ELSENBAUMER RONALD L [US]) [AD] 1-6 * claims 1-35 *;
 [AD]WO8901694  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [AD] 1-6 * claims 1-36 *;
 [AD]WO9010297  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [AD] 1-6 * claims 1-17 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, no. 29, Database accession no. 91-213171, & JPH03137121 A 19910611 (SHOWA DENKO) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850808), vol. 9, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 296), & JP60060166 A 19850406 (SEKISUI) [AD] 1,12 * abstract *