blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0593041

EP0593041 - Ink jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/16]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamiyama, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
02 / Izumida, Masaaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146 / JP
[1994/16]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/16]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date93116574.013.10.1993
[1994/16]
Priority number, dateJP1992027716315.10.1992         Original published format: JP 27716392
JP1992030690717.11.1992         Original published format: JP 30690792
[1994/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0593041
Date:20.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0593041
Date:30.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0593041
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1995
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/05
[1994/16]
CPC:
B41J2/01 (KR); B41J2/04506 (EP,US); B41J2/04528 (EP,US);
B41J2/04565 (EP,US); B41J2/0458 (EP,US); B41J2/0459 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/16]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung[1994/16]
English:Ink jet recording apparatus[1994/16]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre[1994/16]
Examination procedure10.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
06.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2000Fee for grant paid
09.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9006852  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4567353  (AIBA MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * column 1, line 40 - line 50; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0435565  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * column W *;
 [A]EP0376314  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column W *;
 [A]EP0419178  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column W *
ExaminationUS4872027
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.