Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0595219

EP0595219 - Ferroelectric liquid crystal device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Former [1994/18]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yasuda, Akio, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Nito, Keiichi, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Matsui, Eriko, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Takanashi, Hidehiko, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Bao, Yang Ying, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/18]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E. , et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1997/12]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1994/18]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date93117177.122.10.1993
[1994/18]
Priority number, dateJP1992030923824.10.1992         Original published format: JP 30923892
JP1992030923924.10.1992         Original published format: JP 30923992
JP1992034171926.11.1992         Original published format: JP 34171992
JP1993023897331.08.1993         Original published format: JP 23897393
JP1993026295127.09.1993         Original published format: JP 26295193
[1994/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0595219
Date:04.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0595219
Date:09.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0595219
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/137, G02F1/1337
[1994/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/18]
TitleGerman:Ferroelektrische Flüssigkristall-Vorrichtung[1994/18]
English:Ferroelectric liquid crystal device[1994/18]
French:Dispositif à cristal liquide ferro-électrique[1994/18]
Examination procedure09.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
19.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1999Fee for grant paid
23.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97120504.2  / EP0831358
EP97120505.9  / EP0831359
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199503   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0240010  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 1 - line 24 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 6 * * column 12, line 6 - line 23 * * figures 9,10; claims 1,4-17,19-28 *;
 [X]EP0402984  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,6,23,24 * column 2, line 3 - line 33 * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 43 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 16 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]JPH036526  ;
 [XD]JPH03276126  ;
 [XA]  - VERHULST A G H ET AL, "The texture method: an analog gray-scale technique for SSFLC displays based on local reorientation of the smectic layers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE S.I.D, 1991, USA, ISSN 0734-1768, vol. 32, no. 4, pages 379 - 386, XP000281863 [X] 1,3,6,24-26 * the whole document * * idem * [A] 2
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910320), vol. 015, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 1182), [X] 1,5,6 * abstract *
 [XD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920310), vol. 016, no. 096, Database accession no. (P - 1322), [XD] 1,6,7,9,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - MARTINOT-LAGARDE P ET AL, "Temperature dependence of tilt, pitch and polarization in ferroelectric liquid crystals", MOLECULAR CRYSTALS AND LIQUID CRYSTALS, 1981, UK, ISSN 0026-8941, vol. 75, no. 1-4, pages 249 - 286, [A] 4 * abstract; section II *
 [A]  - YASUDA A ET AL, "Molecular alignment engineering for ferroelectric liquid crystals by SiO obliquely evaporated films", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH INT. DISPLAY RESEARCH CONF, JAPAN DISPLAY 92, PAPER P2-21, HIROSHIMA, JAPAN, (19921012), pages 511 - 514, XP000514234 [A] 17-23,25,26 * the whole document *
 [A]  - OUCHI Y ET AL, "Smectic layer structure of thin ferroelectric liquid crystal cells aligned by SiO oblique evaporation technique", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS), NOV. 1988, JAPAN, ISSN 0021-4922, vol. 27, no. 11, pages 1993 - 1995, XP000141611 [A] 25,26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.27.L1993