Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0595270

EP0595270 - Heat sealable shrink laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLIED EXTRUSION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
96 Swampscott Road Salem
Massachusetts 01970 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
APPLIED EXTRUSION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
96 Swampscott Road
Salem Massachusetts 01970 / US
Former [1994/18]For all designated states
HERCULES INCORPORATED
Hercules Plaza
Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hostetter, Barry Jason
11 Hialeah Court, Limestone Hills
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[1994/18]
Representative(s)Vogeser, Werner , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/18]Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
D-81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date93117355.326.10.1993
[1994/18]
Priority number, dateUS1992096624226.10.1992         Original published format: US 966242
[1994/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0595270
Date:04.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0595270
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32
[1994/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/18]
TitleGerman:Heisssiegelbarer mehrschichtiger Schrumpffilm[1994/18]
English:Heat sealable shrink laminate[1994/18]
French:Feuille multicouche thermosoudable rétrécissable[1994/18]
Examination procedure09.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/45]
20.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12)
27.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1999Fee for grant paid
27.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.2000  31.08.2001  WITHDRAWN
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, South Carolina 29334-0464 / US
Opponent's representative
De Carli, Elda
Sealed Air S.p.A.
Packaging Technical Center
Via Trento 7
20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT
 02  05.10.2000  17.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Exxon Chemical Patents, Inc.
5200 Baytown Drive, PO Box 2149
Baytown, Texas, 77522 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/40]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2000  31.08.2001  WITHDRAWN
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, South Carolina 29334-0464 / US
Opponent's representative
De Carli, Elda
Sealed Air S.p.A. Packaging Technical Center Via Trento 7
20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT
 02  05.10.2000  17.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Exxon Chemical Patents, Inc.
5200 Baytown Drive, PO Box 2149
Baytown, Texas, 77522 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/48]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2000   
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, South Carolina 29334-0464 / US
Opponent's representative
De Carli, Elda
Sealed Air S.p.A. Packaging Technical Center Via Trento 7
20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT
 02  05.10.2000   
EXXON Chemical Patents, Inc.
5200 Baytown Drive, PO Box 2149
Baytown, Texas, 77522 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/47]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2000   
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, South Carolina 29334-0464 / US
Opponent's representative
De Carli, Elda
Sealed Air S.p.A. Packaging Technical Center Via Trento 7
20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT
08.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.09.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
02.05.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.07.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.08.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/01]
Request for further processing for:22.05.1996Request for further processing filed
22.05.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.06.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0477742  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0498249  (HERCULES INC [US]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *