blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0595280

EP0595280 - Method and means for breeding and balancing bee populations and for fighting Varroa injection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.1996
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2014Change - classificationpublished on 15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014Change - classificationpublished on 15.10.2014  [2014/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schmidt, Matthias
Friedenstrasse 28
74229 Oedheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/18]For all designated states
Schmidt, Matthias
Friedenstrasse 28
D-74229 Oedheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/18]
Representative(s)Wasmeier, Alfons
Patentanwälte
Graf Wasmeier Glück
Postfach 10 08 26
93008 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Wasmeier, Alfons
Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26
93008 Regensburg / DE
Former [1994/18]Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Wasmeier & Graf, Greflinger Strasse 7, Postfach 10 08 26
D-93008 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date93117374.427.10.1993
[1994/18]
Priority number, dateDE1992423617427.10.1992         Original published format: DE 4236174
[1994/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0595280
Date:04.05.1994
Language:DE
[1994/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0595280
Date:28.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:A01K47/04, A01K51/00
[1994/18]
CPC:
A01K51/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Vermehren und Ausgleichen von Bienen und zum Ausschalten der Varroa-Milben[1994/18]
English:Method and means for breeding and balancing bee populations and for fighting Varroa injection[1994/18]
French:Procédé et installation pour élever et balancer des populations d'abeilles et pour combattre la Varroa[1994/18]
File destroyed:13.09.2003
Examination procedure29.06.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/13]
30.10.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1996/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.1995M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0088333  (G + W SCHREIB- U. ÜBERSETZUNGSBÜRO GMBH) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2611932  (SCHMIDT MATTHIAS);
 [AD]DE3342485  (APIS IMKEREIPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0144863  (APIS IMKEREIPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3411637  (APIS IMKEREIPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0292401  (MATHIEU NORBERT);
 [A]DE4000749  (ARMONIES);
 [E]DE4222602  (SCHMIDT MATTHIAS [DE]) [E] 1,7,9 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.