blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0599086

EP0599086 - Autoloader for cassettes and/or pallet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.1999
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.1999 [1999/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Boutet, John Claude, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Brahm, Roger Standish, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / De Wolff, Darryl David, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Yaskow, Jeffrey James, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[1994/22]
Representative(s)Blickle, K. Werner, et al
KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung
70323 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung
D-70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date93117633.330.10.1993
[1994/22]
Priority number, dateUS1992098171925.11.1992         Original published format: US 981719
[1994/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0599086
Date:01.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0599086
Date:08.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.1994
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/00
[1994/22]
CPC:
H04N1/00604 (EP,US); H04N1/0057 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/22]
TitleGerman:Automatische Ladevorrichtung für Kassetten und/oder Palette[1994/22]
English:Autoloader for cassettes and/or pallet[1994/22]
French:Chargeur automatique pour cassettes et/ou palette[1994/22]
Examination procedure15.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/02]
02.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.01.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.1998Fee for grant paid
16.03.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.04.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4317138  (BRYAN T JAMES, et al) [Y] 17 * column 3, line 24 - line 32 *;
 [A]DE3309220  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]DE3800249  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0278238  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,17 * column 17, line 8 - line 28 *;
 [A]US4786807  (KIMURA TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1,17 * column W *;
 [A]EP0422621  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [YA]EP0452931  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 17 * the whole document * [A] 1;
 [A]US5073829  (KATSUTA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,17 * column 10, line 11 - column 12, line 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.