Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0599200

EP0599200 - Solid state image sensor and its driving method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-1, Saiwai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
Former [1994/22]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Itakura, Keijirou
3-5-407, Higashioda
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
02 / Nobusada, Toshihide
15-1, Soujijiekimae-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
03 / Toyoda, Yasuyuki
2-16-6-303, Senbanishi
Minou-shi, Osaka 562 / JP
04 / Saitoh, Yukio
51-12, Honyashiki, Makishima-cho
Uji-shi, Kyoto 611 / JP
05 / Kokusenya, Nohoru
5-10-9, Oimazatominami, Higashinari-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 537 / JP
06 / Nagayoshi, Kyouichi
2-29-4, Midorigaoka, Suma-ku
Koube-shi, Hyogo 654-01 / JP
07 / Tanaka, Hironori
2-8-628, Saiwai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
08 / Ozaki, Masayoshi
1-23-27, Tsukaguchi-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
[1994/22]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93118582.118.11.1993
[1994/22]
Priority number, dateJP1992031157720.11.1992         Original published format: JP 31157792
JP1992031157820.11.1992         Original published format: JP 31157892
JP1992031824127.11.1992         Original published format: JP 31824192
[1994/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0599200
Date:01.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0599200
Date:09.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0599200
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04N3/15
[1994/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/22]
TitleGerman:Festkörperbildaufnahmevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrem Betrieb[1994/22]
English:Solid state image sensor and its driving method[1994/22]
French:Capteur d'image à l'état solide et procédé pour le commander[1994/22]
Examination procedure22.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/03]
29.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.1999Fee for grant paid
22.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98109663.9  / EP0869664
EP98109664.7  / EP0876053
EP98109665.4  / EP0869665
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH03153176  (NEC CORP) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,8,9;
 [XAY]EP0361938  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 46 - line 49; figures 1,3 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 23; figure 4 * [A] 3,8,9 [Y] 6;
 [XA]EP0286123  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 2,7 * column 10, line 12 - line 48; figure 12 * * column 8, line 15 - line 37; figure 11 * [A] 12;
 [X]US4959724  (UEDA KAZUHIKO [JP]) [X] 10,11 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 6; figure 3 *;
 [X]EP0315778  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 2 * column 1, line 26 - line 28 * * column 1, line 36 - line 40; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0265925  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,3-6,8,9 * column 4, line 45 - line 51; figure 3 *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 15 no. 383 (E-1116) 27 September 1991 * abstract *
 [Y]  - R. NISHIMURA ET AL., "A RGB-gamma CCD camera with a novel color matrix", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK US, vol. 35, no. 3, pages 375 - 380, XP000065833 [Y] 6 * page 375, column L, line 31 - column R, line 7; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.44293