Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0602444

EP0602444 - Safety valve for high-pressure pump; high-pressure water jet machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.1996
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.01.1997 [1997/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hammelmann Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Zum Sundern 13-21
59302 Oelde / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/25]For all designated states
Paul Hammelmann Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Zum Sundern 13-21
D-59302 Oelde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Barnowski, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Ruthenfeld 19
D-59302 Oelde / DE
[1994/25]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/25]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
D-33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date93119250.430.11.1993
[1994/25]
Priority number, dateDE1992424134409.12.1992         Original published format: DE 4241344
[1994/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0602444
Date:22.06.1994
Language:DE
[1994/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0602444
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1994
ClassificationInternational:F16K17/04
[1994/25]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1994/25]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsventil für Hochdruckpumpen, Hochdruckwasserstrahlmaschinen od.dgl.[1994/25]
English:Safety valve for high-pressure pump; high-pressure water jet machine[1994/25]
French:Vanne de sécurité pour pompe à haute pression; machine à jets d'eau à haute pression[1994/25]
Examination procedure09.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/32]
26.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.1995Fee for grant paid
12.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YA]US3780759  (YAHLE) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 21 * [A] 2-9;
 [Y]EP0158776  (DRÄGER) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2110906  (AMERICAN) [A] 2 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3107775  (MANNESMANN)