EP0627723 - Keyboard instrument having catcher stopper for silent performance on keyboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Kiyoshi, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119313.0 | 30.11.1993 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930157934 | 03.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15793493 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0627723 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0627723 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627723 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G10C3/16, G10C5/00 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
G10C3/16 (EP,KR,US);
G10H1/34 (KR);
G10C5/10 (EP,US);
Y10S84/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/49] | Title | German: | Tasteninstrument mit Fänger für stilles Spiel auf Tastatur | [2000/23] | English: | Keyboard instrument having catcher stopper for silent performance on keyboard | [1994/49] | French: | Instument à touches muni des arrêts pour une performance à touches muettes | [1994/49] |
Former [1994/49] | Tastaturinstrument mit Auffänger für stille Tastaturspielart | Examination procedure | 30.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1996 | 30.11.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.11.2000 | [2002/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3707591 (SEILER ED PIANOFORTEFAB GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9107740 (PETERSEN ERIK INGVOR [DK]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 7 - line 20; figures 1,2 * * page 15, line 22 - line 36 *; | [E]EP0617404 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * abstract *; | [E]US5440072 (WILLIS RAYMON A [US]) [E] 1* claims 1,3,4 * |