blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0609530

EP0609530 - Electronic ammunition fuze housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.1999
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.1999 [1999/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1994/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Bai, Monty W.
8107 East Cholla
Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US
02 / Minks, Danny Earl
2765 E. Rockledge Road
Phoenix, Arizona 850446 / US
[1994/32]
Representative(s)Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property
Midpoint
Alencon Link, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/32]Hudson, Peter David, et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date93120275.816.12.1993
[1994/32]
Priority number, dateUS1993001158001.02.1993         Original published format: US 11580
[1994/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0609530
Date:10.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.1994
ClassificationIPC:F42C19/02
[1994/32]
CPC:
F42C19/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1994/32]
TitleGerman:Gehäuse eines elektronischen Munitionszünders[1994/32]
English:Electronic ammunition fuze housing[1994/32]
French:Corps d'une fusée électronique de munitions[1994/32]
Examination procedure10.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/15]
07.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.07.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/51]
28.07.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1999/51]
Request for further processing for:28.11.1995Request for further processing filed
28.11.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.12.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199806   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4034674  (ABT EDGAR JOHN) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 14-24 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, lines 38-50; figures 1,1A,3,4 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 68 *;
 [A]US4490721  ;
 [A]DE3013376  (SOBBE FRIEDRICH WILHELM);
 [A]US3000310  (POWER WALTER C, et al);
 [A]US2741181  (MARKS WILLIAM S);
 [A]US2990777  (GARMAN KENNETH C);
 [A]DE3324324  (HONEYWELL GMBH [DE])
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 02, Database accession no. 85011968, & US4490721 A 19841225 (BALL CORP) [A] 3,4 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.