Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0606618

EP0606618 - A polyolefinic resin and a resin composition comprising said resin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1996/13]
Former [1994/29]For all designated states
IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. LTD.
1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuruoka, Masayuki, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem.
Co., Ltd., 1-1, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Tanaka, Akira, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem.
Co., Ltd., 1-1, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Nakagawa, Masaru, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem.
Co., Ltd., 1-1, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1994/29]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/29]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date93120489.518.12.1993
[1994/29]
Priority number, dateJP1992034564025.12.1992         Original published format: JP 34564092
JP1992034564125.12.1992         Original published format: JP 34564192
[1994/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0606618
Date:20.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0606618
Date:19.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0606618
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00, C08F4/654, C08L23/10
[1994/29]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1994/29]
TitleGerman:Polyolefinharz und dieses Harz enthaltende Zusammensetzung[1994/29]
English:A polyolefinic resin and a resin composition comprising said resin[1994/29]
French:Résine polyoléfinique et composition contenant cette résine[1994/29]
Examination procedure22.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
18.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1999Fee for grant paid
14.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.05.2000
FR10.05.2000
SE10.08.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/27]BE10.05.2000
SE10.08.2000
FR06.10.2000
Former [2001/24]BE10.05.2000
FR06.10.2000
Former [2001/11]BE10.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0455813  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [DA]JPH0314851  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) [DA] 1-11;
 [DA]JPH03168234  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) [DA] 1-11;
 [A]EP0433989  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6-11 * example - *;
 [A]EP0119508  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 6-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0316692  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 6-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0096968  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claim - *