blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581361

EP0581361 - Multipurpose drip catcher [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.10.1997
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.12.1997 [1997/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andersen, Carl Erik
Lovfaldsvej 20 B, Skaerbaek
DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK
For all designated states
Kramer, Ole
Tornevangsvej 34F
DK-3460 Birkerod / DK
[1994/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Rindorf, Hans Joergen, et al
Hofman-Bang Zacco A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [1996/32]Rindorf, Hans Joergen, et al
c/o Lehmann & Ree A/S Grundtvigsvej 37
1864 Frederiksberg C / DK
Former [1996/19](deleted)
Former [1996/18]Rindorf, Hans Joergen, et al
c/o Lehmann & Ree A/S Grundtvigsvej 37
DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK
Former [1994/05]Lomholt, Lars A., et al
c/o Lehmann & Ree A/S Grundtvigsvej 37
DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK
Application number, filing date93202075.315.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateDK1992000095428.07.1992         Original published format: DK 95492
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0581361
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581361
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1993
ClassificationIPC:A47G19/14, B65D23/06
[1994/05]
CPC:
B65D23/065 (EP,US); A47G19/145 (EP,US); Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US); Y10T428/23 (EP,US); Y10T428/239 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US); Y10T428/24331 (EP,US); Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24793 (EP,US); Y10T428/24942 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Mehrzweck-Tropfenfänger[1994/05]
English:Multipurpose drip catcher[1994/05]
French:Ramasse-gouttes polyvalent[1994/05]
Examination procedure23.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
20.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.1996Fee for grant paid
20.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4437583  (O'CONNOR RODNEY J [US]);
 [AD]DE896014  (DOHMEN PAUL DR MED, et al);
 [A]DE886857  (DOHMEN PAUL DR MED, et al);
 [A]GB2224260  (LAGNADO EDWARD JOSEPH, et al);
 [AD]US3063590  (HOPKINS PETER S);
 [A]DE437230  (REINHARD WICKE);
 [A]CH342858  (DUFNER & CO [CH]);
 [A]DE8810559U  ;
 [AD]US4415100  (HUTCHINSON ROBERT S [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.