Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0603947

EP0603947 - Coding apparatus for digital television image signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1998/35]For:FR 
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS S.A.S.
22, Avenue Descartes
94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR
For:DE  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1996/03]For:FR 
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS S.A.S.
22, Avenue Descartes
F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR
For:DE  GB 
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1994/32]For:FR 
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS
22, Avenue Descartes
F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR
For:DE  GB 
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1994/26]For:FR 
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS
22, Avenue Descartes
F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR
For:DE  GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Guede, Frédérique
Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1994/26]
Representative(s)Landousy, Christian , et al
Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313
92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Landousy, Christian , et al
Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/11]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
International Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [1994/26]Landousy, Christian , et al
Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date93203539.715.12.1993
[1994/26]
Priority number, dateFR1992001550422.12.1992         Original published format: FR 9215504
[1994/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0603947
Date:29.06.1994
Language:FR
[1994/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0603947
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/30
[1999/49]
Former International [1994/26]H04N7/133
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/26]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Kodierung von digitalen Fernbildsignalen[1994/26]
English:Coding apparatus for digital television image signals[1994/26]
French:Dispositif de codage de signaux numériques représentatifs d'images de télévision[1994/26]
Examination procedure29.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/09]
26.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2000Fee for grant paid
28.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0451545  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2;
 [AY]WO8702854  (EUDE GERARD) [A] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2;
 [A]EP0510972  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, column L, line 50 - page 5, column L, line 28; figures 5-8 *;
 [A]EP0490799  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0508351  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *