Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0573133

EP0573133 - Means for transdermal application of Gestoden [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.02.1999
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.1999 [1999/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schering Aktiengesellschaft
13342 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]For all designated states
SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-13342 Berlin / DE
Former [1993/49]For all designated states
SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-13342 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Günther, Clemens
Birkenstrasse 5
D-1000 Berlin 21 / DE
02 / Täuber, Ulrich
Soldiner Strasse 13
D-13359 Berlin / DE
03 / Schmidt-Gollwitzer, Karin
Am Sandwerder 36
D-1000 Berlin 39 / DE
04 / Tack, Johannes-Wilhelm
Tharsanderweg 42
D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE
05 / Riedl, Jutta
Friedbergstrasse 21
D-1000 Berlin 21 / DE
[1993/49]
Application number, filing date93250189.311.10.1989
[1993/49]
Priority number, dateDE1988383686227.10.1988         Original published format: DE 3836862
DE1989391057829.03.1989         Original published format: DE 3910578
[1993/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0573133
Date:08.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/565, A61K9/70
[1993/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/49]
TitleGerman:Mittel zur transdermalen Applikation das Gestoden enthält[1993/49]
English:Means for transdermal application of Gestoden[1993/49]
French:Application transdermique contenant du Gestoden[1993/49]
Examination procedure23.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/49]
18.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1998Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/15]
28.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1999/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89912449.9  / EP0394429
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
17.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
16.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0275716  (UNIV NEW JERSEY [US]);
 [Y]EP0279977  (ALZA CORP [US]);
 [Y]EP0285563  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [YD]EP0137278  (SCHERING AG [DE])
 [Y]  - STN INTERNATIONAL FILE SUPPLIER