Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0551178 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0551178



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 378
26.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.03.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.02.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 13
27.02.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.02.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.12.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
10.12.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.12.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 11
05.12.2003 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
13.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.11.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
31.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 4
24.09.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
24.09.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.09.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.12.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
13.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.2001 Claims Appeal 2
23.01.2001 Description Appeal 3
23.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
01.12.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.12.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.07.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.07.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
25.05.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.05.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.05.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.04.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.03.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
21.03.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
21.03.2000 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.03.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.03.2000 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
22.02.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.2000 Claims Opposition 2
17.01.2000 Claims Opposition 2
17.01.2000 Description Opposition 4
17.01.2000 Description Opposition 4
17.01.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.07.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.06.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.06.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.05.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
28.05.1999 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
28.05.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
28.05.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.05.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.04.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
06.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.1998 Claims Opposition 2
30.10.1998 Description Opposition 4
30.10.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
12.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.05.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.05.1998 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.04.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.03.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.03.1998 Authorisation Opposition 1
25.03.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.03.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.03.1998 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.03.1998 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
18.03.1998 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
12.05.1997 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.03.1997 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.03.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.03.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.12.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
09.12.1996 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.12.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
05.12.1996 Description Search / examination 2
05.12.1996 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.09.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.09.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
19.08.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.06.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
18.06.1996 Description Search / examination 4
18.06.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.02.1994 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
28.07.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.07.1993 European search report Search / examination 4
11.03.1993 Drawings Search / examination 11
11.03.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.03.1993 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.03.1993 Priority document Search / examination 24
03.03.1993 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
06.01.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
06.01.1993 Description Search / examination 8
06.01.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.1993 Drawings Search / examination 11
06.01.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.01.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5