Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0554988

EP0554988 - Mixing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.1997
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATERIAL ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY LABORATORY, INC.
21-13, Ohhara 2-chome
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 156 / JP
[1993/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Isono, Keinosuke
46-112, Ohazaangyotouhachi
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Suzuki, Tatsuo
5-27-302, Oyamadasakuradai 1-chome
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1993/32]
Representative(s)Harvey, David Gareth , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/32]Harvey, David Gareth , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date93300416.021.01.1993
[1993/32]
Priority number, dateJP1992004806004.02.1992         Original published format: JP 4806092
[1993/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0554988
Date:11.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0554988
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/00
[1993/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1993/32]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Vermischen[1993/32]
English:Mixing apparatus[1993/32]
French:Dispositif pour mélanger[1993/32]
Examination procedure18.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/11]
22.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.10.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1995Fee for grant paid
20.12.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.01.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.04.1996
CH17.04.1996
LI17.04.1996
NL17.04.1996
[2003/08]
Former [1997/28]BE17.04.1996
CH17.04.1996
LI17.04.1996
Former [1997/20]BE17.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8303540  (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]);
 [A]EP0363770  (SCHIWA GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0395758  (TERUMO CORP [JP]);
 [AD]WO8503432  (TRAVENOL EUROP RES & DEV [BE])