Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0561644

EP0561644 - Modem unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/38]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Arai, Yasuhiro, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / Maruo, Nobuhide, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
03 / Narita, Yoshiaki, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1993/38]
Representative(s)Abrams, Michael John , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/38]Abrams, Michael John , et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date93302087.718.03.1993
[1993/38]
Priority number, dateJP1992006426419.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6426492
JP1992006426619.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6426692
JP1992006426519.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6426592
JP1992012511118.05.1992         Original published format: JP 12511192
JP1992012511018.05.1992         Original published format: JP 12511092
JP1992013725328.05.1992         Original published format: JP 13725392
[1993/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0561644
Date:22.09.1993
Language:EN
[1993/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0561644
Date:17.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0561644
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06
[1993/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/38]
TitleGerman:Modemeinrichtung[1993/38]
English:Modem unit[1993/38]
French:Dispositif modem[1993/38]
MiscellaneousEPB 2000/01: (deleted)
EPB 2000/01: (deleted)
EPB 2000/01: (deleted)
EPB 1995/29: Teilanmeldung 95106588.7 eingereicht am 18/03/93
EPB 1995/29: Divisional application 95106588.7 filed on 18/03/93
EPB 1995/29: Demande divisionnaire 95106588.7 déposée le 18/03/93
Examination procedure26.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/30]
12.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.1999Fee for grant paid
28.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95106588.7  / EP0667701
EP98116841.2  / EP0887990
EP98116842.0  / EP0886426
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2061672  (STERLAND M J N, et al) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6229344  ;
 [A]JPS63180121
 [Y]  - S. EDISON, "Single chip FSK modem for leased line and videotex", ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, LONDON GB, (198406), vol. 56, no. 690, XP002105025 [Y] 1,2,17 * pages 55-58,61,62,65 * * page 55, column L, line 1 - page 56, column L, line 39 * * page 65, column L, line 11 - line 20 * * figure 9 *
 [Y]  - "Direct-coupled modem", ELEKTOR, UK, (198410), no. 10, pages 48 - 55, [Y] 1,2,17 * page 49, column L, line 50 - line 66 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870707), vol. 11, no. 209, Database accession no. (E - 521), [A] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881202), vol. 12, no. 458, Database accession no. (P - 794), [A] 21 * abstract *
 [A]  - J. KREBS, "Portable conputer and host talk over radio-frequency link", ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, NEW YORK US, (198308), vol. 56, no. 17, pages 142 - 145, [A] 1,17-23
ExaminationUS4417099