Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0564182

EP0564182 - Compensation of residual afterglow from previous computed tomography scans [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/40]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hsieh, Jiang
1736 Erin Lane
Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US
02 / Senzig, Robert Franklin
W164 N10535 Timberline
Germantown, Wisconsin 53022 / US
[1993/40]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Former [1993/40]Lupton, Frederick , et al
LONDON PATENT OPERATION, G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date93302349.126.03.1993
[1993/40]
Priority number, dateUS1992086065930.03.1992         Original published format: US 860659
[1993/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0564182
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0564182
Date:21.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0564182
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00
[1999/50]
Former International [1993/40]G06F15/72
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [1993/40]
TitleGerman:Kompensation von Nachleuchtzeit aus den vorhergehenden Computertomographieabtastungen[1993/40]
English:Compensation of residual afterglow from previous computed tomography scans[1993/40]
French:Compensation de la persistance lumineux résiduelle à partir de balayages précédentes de tomographie par calculateur[1993/40]
Examination procedure21.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/08]
12.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2000Fee for grant paid
09.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.03.2001
[2002/16]
Documents cited:Search[E]US5249123  (HSIEH JIANG [US]) [E] 1-7 * claims 1-9 *;
 [PA]EP0487243  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PA] 1-7 * claims 5,14 *