Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0572113 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0572113



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 650
28.01.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.01.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
22.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2007 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Opposition 1
11.01.2007 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Opposition 1
11.01.2007 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
11.01.2007 French translation of claims Opposition 1
11.01.2007 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
28.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
13.12.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
13.12.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.10.2006 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
16.10.2006 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
05.10.2006 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
24.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.12.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
25.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
25.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
25.07.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
25.07.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.06.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.04.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
09.12.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
01.12.2004 Description Appeal 1
01.12.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.11.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.11.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.11.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.11.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.11.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.08.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
13.07.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.07.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
01.07.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.04.2003 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2003 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2003 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2003 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2003 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2003 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.04.2003 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 10
07.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
17.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.03.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.02.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.01.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.01.1999 Annex Appeal 2
19.01.1999 Claims Appeal 2
19.01.1999 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.1999 Claims Appeal 1
19.01.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
25.11.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
18.11.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.06.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
28.05.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.05.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.05.1998 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.05.1998 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
23.04.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
11.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.03.1998 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
23.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
16.02.1998 Authorisation Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
16.02.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Means of redress Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
02.02.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
30.01.1998 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 2
30.01.1998 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
29.01.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
30.12.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.1997 Description Opposition 1
29.11.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
02.09.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
02.09.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
24.07.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.07.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.07.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.07.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.06.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
20.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.1996 Description Opposition 1
13.12.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.12.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
27.09.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.08.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.08.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.08.1996 N/A Opposition 1
16.08.1996 N/A Opposition 1
08.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.07.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
02.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
02.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.06.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
28.06.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
27.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.06.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
26.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.06.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
18.08.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.05.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
04.05.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
29.03.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
13.03.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.12.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.12.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
07.12.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
31.08.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.1993 European search report Search / examination 2
15.04.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.04.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
15.04.1993 Description Search / examination 8
15.04.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.1993 Priority document Search / examination 18
15.04.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5