Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0567344

EP0567344 - Method and apparatus for character recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1993/43]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
CANON INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
3188 Pullman Street
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Shin-Ywan, c/o Canon Information Systems
188 Pullman Street
Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US
02 / Vaezi, Mehrzad R., c/o Canon Information Systems
188 Pullman Street
Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US
03 / Sherrick, Christopher A., c/o Canon Info. Systems
188 Pullman Street
Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US
[1993/43]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/43]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date93303194.023.04.1993
[1993/43]
Priority number, dateUS1992087301224.04.1992         Original published format: US 873012
[1993/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0567344
Date:27.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0567344
Date:14.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0567344
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/20, G06K9/34
[1993/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zeichenerkennung[1993/43]
English:Method and apparatus for character recognition[1993/43]
French:Méthode et dispositif de reconnaissance de caractères[1993/43]
Examination procedure27.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/13]
20.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2002Fee for grant paid
29.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Request for further processing for:08.02.2001Request for further processing filed
08.02.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.05.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO8002761  (DEST DATA CORPORATION) [X] 68-108,148-150 * figure 6 * [Y] 109-138;
 [X]WO9206448  (CGK COMPUTER GESELLSCHAFT KONSTANZ MBH) [X] 68-108,148-150 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5101448  (KAWACHIYA ET AL.) [A] 10-16,37-42,48-52 * the whole document *;
 [XY]  - YAMADA M., HASUIKE K., "Document Image Processing Based on Enhanced Border Following Algorithm", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH INTRNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, CAT. NO. CH2898-5/90,, BALLY'S PARK PLACE HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY, NEW JERSEY, USA, (19900621), vol. 2, pages 231 - 236, XP000166494 [X] 1-9,17-36,43-47,144,145,151 [Y] 109-138

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1990.119360
 [X]  - MIZUNO M. ET AL., "Document Recognition System with Layout Structure Generator", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, TOKYO JP, (199107), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 430 - 437, XP000265886 [X] 1-9,19-36,43-47,144,145,151
 [X]  - FLETCHER L.A. AND KASTURI R., "A Robust Algorithm for Text String Separation from Mixed Text/Graphics Images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, NEW YORK US, (198811), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 910 - 918, XP000112065 [X] 1-9,19-36,43-47,144,145,151

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.9112
 [A]  - PIZANO A. ET AL., "A Business Form Recognition system", COMPSAC91 PROCEEDINGS, THE FIFTEENTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE & APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, KOGAKUIN UNIVERSITY, TOKYO, JAPAN, (19910913), pages 626 - 632, XP000260573 [A] 10-16,37-42,48-52
 [X]  - "LINE SEGMENTATION METHOD FOR DOCUMENTS IN EUROPEAN LANGUAGES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199006), vol. 33, no. 1B, pages 207 - 210 [X] 53-67,147
 [X]  - MASUDA I. ET AL., "Approach to Smart Document Reader System", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, CAT. NO. CH2145-1/85,, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA, (19850623), pages 550 - 557 [X] 150 * 3.1 Skew-normalization *
Examination   - Qin LUO et al., "A Structural Recognition Method for Japanese Newspapers", Symposium on Document Analysis and Information Retrieval, March 1992, pp. 217-234
    - Shuichi TSUJIMOTO et al., "Understanding Multi-articled Documents", IEEE Proceedings of the 10th Int. Conf. on Pattern Recognition, 16-21 June 1990