Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0576220

EP0576220 - Bar-code reader device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.1999
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.10.1999 [1999/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1993/52]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Katsushi
37-8, Katsura Hitsujisarucho, Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto-shi / JP
02 / Tamai, Seiichiro
18-14, Kofudai-6-chome, Toyonocho
Toyono-gun, Osaka / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Keiichi
10-40-301, Shimorokumanjicho-1-chome
Higashiosaka-shi / JP
04 / Dosho (née Tashiro), Marie
3-305, Myokenzaka-6-chome
Katano-shi / JP
[1993/52]
Representative(s)Votier, Sidney David
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1993/52]
Application number, filing date93304784.718.06.1993
[1993/52]
Priority number, dateJP1992016154322.06.1992         Original published format: JP 16154392
[1993/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0576220
Date:29.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0576220
Date:19.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0576220
Date:04.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[1993/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/52]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Lesen von Strichkoden[1993/52]
English:Bar-code reader device[1993/52]
French:Dispositif lecteur de codes à barres[1993/52]
Examination procedure02.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/31]
09.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.05.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.1998Fee for grant paid
06.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.08.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0384955  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [X] 1-8 * column 9, line 45 - column 16, line 24 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0273554  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [A] 1
ExaminationEP0385478
 WO9318478