Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0576270 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0576270



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 319
03.11.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 39
03.11.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
26.08.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
07.04.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.04.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.03.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
09.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
02.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
31.01.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.11.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.11.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.07.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.07.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.07.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
24.05.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.05.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.05.2000 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
16.05.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
14.03.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
14.03.2000 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
14.03.2000 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 19
14.03.2000 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
14.03.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.12.1999 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.1999 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.1999 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.12.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
21.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.04.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
08.04.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
22.02.1999 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
11.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
10.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.02.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.02.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.01.1999 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.10.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
14.10.1998 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
13.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.1998 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
15.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
04.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.04.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1998 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
07.04.1998 Claims Opposition 3
07.04.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.04.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.02.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.10.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.10.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.07.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.07.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.07.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.10.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.07.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.07.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.05.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
26.04.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.01.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.01.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
22.12.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.03.1994 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
17.09.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.09.1993 European search report Search / examination 2
08.07.1993 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 8
08.07.1993 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
23.06.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
23.06.1993 Description Search / examination 7
23.06.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.06.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6