blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581487

EP0581487 - Shuttle printers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1998
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.1999 [1999/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshino, Satoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / Nojiri, Keiko
101 House Adonis, 821 Ida, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date93305512.114.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateJP1992020255129.07.1992         Original published format: JP 20255192
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0581487
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0581487
Date:04.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581487
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:B41J25/304, B41J19/30
[1995/01]
CPC:
B41J25/006 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1994/05]B41J25/304
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Schwingrahmendrucker[1994/05]
English:Shuttle printers[1994/05]
French:Imprimantes à navette[1994/05]
Examination procedure02.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/28]
03.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1997Fee for grant paid
30.09.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4941405  (HELMS CLIFF [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 61; figures 1,10 *;
 [A]US4359289  (BARRUS GORDON B, et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 31 - column 10, line 10; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.