Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0612012

EP0612012 - A pipeline computer with scoreboard [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakada, Tatsumi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / Ohshima, Toshiharu, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1994/34]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date93307302.516.09.1993
[1994/34]
Priority number, dateJP1993002684516.02.1993         Original published format: JP 2684593
[1994/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0612012
Date:24.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0612012
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38
[1994/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/34]
TitleGerman:Pipeline-Rechner mit Anzeigetafel[1994/34]
English:A pipeline computer with scoreboard[1994/34]
French:Ordinateur pipeline avec tableau d'affichage[1994/34]
Examination procedure04.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/40]
19.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:28.11.1998Request for further processing filed
16.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0487317  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 25; column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 40; column 9, lines 10-21 *;
 [A]JPH03269628
 [A]  - TALGAM, "Shadow scoreboard and implementation", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS US, (198810), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 43 - 44, [A] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920228), vol. 16, no. 85, Database accession no. (P - 1319), [A] 1 * abstract *