Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0588646

EP0588646 - Automatic telephone system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comverse Network Systems, Inc.
100 Quannapowitt Parkway Wakefield
Massachusetts 01880 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
Comverse Network Systems, Inc.
100 Quannapowitt Parkway
Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US
Former [1994/12]For all designated states
BOSTON TECHNOLOGY INC.
100 Quannapowitt Parkway
Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Scott A.
51 Paine Avenue
Prides Crossing, MA 01965 / US
[1994/12]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date93307332.216.09.1993
[1994/12]
Priority number, dateUS1992094689518.09.1992         Original published format: US 946895
[1994/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0588646
Date:23.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0588646
Date:22.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0588646
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04M3/54
[1994/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/12]
TitleGerman:Automatisches Fernsprechsystem[1994/12]
English:Automatic telephone system[1994/12]
French:Système de téléphonie automatique[1994/12]
Examination procedure22.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/08]
30.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1999Fee for grant paid
27.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
GB16.09.2000
LU16.09.2000
ES17.09.2000
FR30.09.2000
[2008/41]
Former [2004/39]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
GB16.09.2000
LU16.09.2000
ES17.09.2000
Former [2004/28]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
GB16.09.2000
ES17.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
GB16.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
GB16.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
GB16.09.2000
Former [2002/12]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
GB16.09.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9222164  (AUTO EX [US]) [PX] 1,5,9,10,14,15,17,19-22 * abstract * * page 7, line 29 - page 11, line 15 *;
 [X]US4674115  (KALEITA DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11,15,16,19,22 * column 2, line 38 - line 52; claims 1-4,10 *;
 [X]DE3501814  (TERADYNE INC [US]) [X] 1,5,9,10,15,19,22 * page 35, line 23 - page 36, line 32; figures 12A,12B; claim 1 *;
 [DA]US5029196  (MORGANSTEIN SANFORD J [US]) [DA] 1,9-12,14,17,18 * column 11, line 3 - column 13, line 8; figures 4A,4B *;
 [A]EP0295470  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,9,15 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS63152258  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881102), vol. 12, no. 414, Database accession no. (E - 677), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - HATTORI ET AL., "Personal communication - concept and architecture", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS - ICC '90, ATLANTA US, (19900415), vol. 4, pages 1351 - 1357, XP000146025