blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0592184

EP0592184 - Apparatus for detecting defects at gas exhaust line in casting machine and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.1998
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RYOBI LTD.
No. 762, Mesaki-cho Fuchu-shi
Hiroshima-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]For all designated states
RYOBI LTD.
No. 762, Mesaki-cho
Fuchu-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miwa, Tomoyoshi, c/o Ryobi Ltd.
No. 762 Mesaki-cho
Fuchu-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
02 / Yamauchi, Noriyoshi, c/o Ryobi Ltd.
No. 762 Mesaki-cho
Fuchu-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
03 / Ishida, Hitoshi, c/o Ryobi Ltd.
No. 762 Mesaki-cho
Fuchu-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
[1994/15]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date93307891.705.10.1993
[1994/15]
Priority number, dateJP1992029764709.10.1992         Original published format: JP 29764792
[1994/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0592184
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0592184
Date:01.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0592184
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:B22D17/14, B22D17/32
[1994/15]
CPC:
B22D17/32 (EP,US); B22D17/145 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1994/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Fehlern bei einer Entlüftungsvorrichtung einer Giessmaschine[1994/15]
English:Apparatus for detecting defects at gas exhaust line in casting machine and method therefor[1994/15]
French:Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance de défauts dans un système de dégazage d'une machine de coulée[1994/15]
Examination procedure29.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
10.01.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.05.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.1997Fee for grant paid
01.08.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT29.12.1997
[2008/05]
Former [1999/42]IT29.12.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6123561  ;
 [A]JPS60162566  ;
 [DA]JPS62137164  ;
 [A]US5086824  (TSUDA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860619), vol. 10, no. 174, Database accession no. (M - 490)<2230>, & JP61023561 A 19860201 (TOSHIBA KIKAI K.K.) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851225), vol. 9, no. 330, Database accession no. (M - 442)<2053>, & JP60162566 A 19850824 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K.) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871125), vol. 11, no. 360, Database accession no. (M - 645), & JP62137164 A 19870620 (MAKINO HIROSHI) [DA] 1-6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.