Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0597623

EP0597623 - Shoulder brace [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1998
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US
Former [1994/20]For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW DONJOY INC.
2777 Loker Avenue West, Suite 100
Carlsbad, CA 92008-6601 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bastyr, Charles A.
12476 Rue Fountain Bleau
San Diego, California 92131 / US
02 / Winer, David B.
3142 Midway Drive B202
San Diego, California 92110 / US
03 / Tillinghast, Theodore V III.
2216 Plaza Bonita
Carlsbad, California 92009 / US
04 / Ross, Stephen O.
2625 Cove Court
Vista, California 92083 / US
[1998/04]
Former [1994/20]01 / Bastyr, Charles A.
12476 Rue Fountain Bleau
San Diego, California 92131 / US
02 / Winer, David B.
3142 Midway Drive B202
San Diego, California 92110 / US
03 / Tillinghast III, Theodore V.
2216 Plaza Bonita
Carlsbad, California 92009 / US
04 / Ross, Stephen O.
2625 Cove Court
Vista, California 92083 / US
Representative(s)Koepsell, Helmut
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/44]Koepsell, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [1994/20]Gilholm, Stephen Philip
Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park
Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB
Application number, filing date93308794.203.11.1993
[1994/20]
Priority number, dateUS1992097560812.11.1992         Original published format: US 975608
[1994/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0597623
Date:18.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0597623
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/01, A61F5/04
[1994/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/20]
TitleGerman:Schulterschiene[1994/20]
English:Shoulder brace[1994/20]
French:Attelle pour l'épaule[1994/20]
Examination procedure11.11.1993Examination requested  [1994/20]
29.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.05.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.1997Fee for grant paid
19.06.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
CH21.01.1998
ES21.01.1998
GR21.01.1998
LI21.01.1998
NL21.01.1998
DK21.04.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
[2003/45]
Former [2003/08]AT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
CH21.01.1998
ES21.01.1998
GR21.01.1998
LI21.01.1998
NL21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [2002/26]AT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
CH21.01.1998
ES21.01.1998
GR21.01.1998
LI21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [2001/23]AT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
CH21.01.1998
GR21.01.1998
LI21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [1998/50]AT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
CH21.01.1998
LI21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [1998/49]AT21.01.1998
BE21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [1998/47]AT21.01.1998
PT21.04.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [1998/43]AT21.01.1998
SE21.04.1998
Former [1998/40]AT21.01.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]US1961118  (ETTINGER) [A] 1,4-6,8,10 * page 1, line 11 - line 15; figure -; claim . *;
 [A]US2010328  (SIEBRANDT) [A] 1,2,10 * page 1, column R, line 53 - page 2, column L, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [A]US1639815  (SIEBRANDT) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 11 - line 15; figure -; claim 1 *