blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0599542

EP0599542 - Two element optical system for focus error compensation in laser scanning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.1998
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.06.1998 [1998/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Patrick Y.
900 Camino Real No. 102
Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US
[1994/22]
Representative(s)Mackett, Margaret, et al
Rank Xerox Ltd
Patent Department
Parkway
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Former [1995/05]Goode, Ian Roy, et al
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Former [1994/22]Goode, Ian Roy
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date93309186.018.11.1993
[1994/22]
Priority number, dateUS1992098233027.11.1992         Original published format: US 982330
[1994/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0599542
Date:01.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0599542
Date:02.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1994
ClassificationIPC:G02B27/00
[1994/22]
CPC:
G02B7/28 (EP,US); G02B26/128 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/22]
TitleGerman:Optisches System aus zwei Elementen zur Kompensation des Brennpunktsfehlers in Laserabtastsystemen[1994/22]
English:Two element optical system for focus error compensation in laser scanning systems[1994/22]
French:Système électique deux éléments pour la compensation d'aberration focus dans des systèmes de balayage à laser[1994/22]
Examination procedure21.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/17]
27.01.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.02.1997Fee for grant paid
27.02.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.03.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)03.04.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.01.1995M01   Fee paid on   21.02.1995
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5054866  (TOMITA KAN [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4941721  (BANTON MARTIN E [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5033806  (TOMITA KAN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0465136  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE3743837  (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.