Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0601749

EP0601749 - A video processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUANTEL LIMITED
Pear Tree Lane Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2LT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
QUANTEL LIMITED
Pear Tree Lane
Newbury Berkshire RG14 2LT / GB
Former [1994/24]For all designated states
QUANTEL LIMITED
Pear Tree Lane
Newbury Berkshire RG13 2LT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Stewart, Ian Malcoln
Ashmore Green Road, Ashmore Green
Newbury, Berkshire RG16 9EX / GB
02 / Beckwith, Timothy John
2 Delafield Drive, Calcot
Reading, Berkshire RG3 7EB / GB
[1994/24]
Representative(s)Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/24]Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date93309448.426.11.1993
[1994/24]
Priority number, dateGB1993001662610.08.1993         Original published format: GB 9316626
GB1992002557507.12.1992         Original published format: GB 9225575
[1994/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0601749
Date:15.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0601749
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/262, G11B27/031
[1994/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/24]
TitleGerman:Videoverarbeitungssystem[1994/24]
English:A video processing system[1994/24]
French:Système de traitement vidéo[1994/24]
Examination procedure06.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/05]
17.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Request for further processing for:14.05.1998Request for further processing filed
14.05.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.06.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0438299  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8,15-19 * column 5, line 3 - column 13, line 23 * * column 1, line 2 - column 3, line 57 * [A] 9-14;
 [Y]WO9110321  (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-8,15-19 * page 1, line 6 - page 6, line 9 * * page 18, line 1 - line 20 *;
 [Y]JPH02103666  ;
 [A]EP0396415  (QUANTEL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 15 * * column 7, line 10 - line 14 *;
 [A]JPH01186059  ;
 [A]EP0387981  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 14 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 31 *;
 [A]GB2235815  (COMPACT VIDEO GROUP INC [US]) [A] 17-19 * page 1, line 1 - page 12, line 20 * * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 23 *;
 [DPA]EP0560624  (QUANTEL LTD [GB])
 [Y]  - J. K. R. HEITMANN, "Development of component digital VTRs and the potential of the D-1 format", SMPTE JOURNAL, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (198802), vol. 97, no. 2, pages 126 - 129, [Y] 3 * page 127, column M, line 24 - column R, line 10 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900709), vol. 14, no. 317, Database accession no. (P - 1073), [Y] 5-7 * abstract *
 [Y]  - B. PANK, "New technology in still stores - What are the implications?", SMPTE JOURNAL, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (199208), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 550 - 552, XP000296027 [Y] 15,16 * page 551, column L, line 22 - line 53 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891026), vol. 13, no. 474, Database accession no. (E - 836), [A] 1,8,14 * abstract *