blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0600718 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0600718



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1295
06.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.12.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
23.11.1999 Description Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 4
22.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
18.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 164
17.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 5
26.11.1998 Description Search / examination 16
26.11.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.10.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.10.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.10.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.06.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.12.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
14.10.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.06.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
13.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
13.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
13.12.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.08.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.1996 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
29.09.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.1995 European search report Search / examination 15
02.11.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
11.10.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.10.1994 Partial European search report Search / examination 10
14.06.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
02.04.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 63
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 51
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 39
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 102
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 62
02.04.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 139
28.01.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 76
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 24
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 29
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 51
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 40
28.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 38
30.11.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.11.1993 Claims Search / examination 27
30.11.1993 Description Search / examination 242
30.11.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.1993 Drawings Search / examination 7
30.11.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
30.11.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5