blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0600718


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
12.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.11.1999 Renewal fee
19.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
19.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
13.05.1999 Change - German title published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]
01.12.1998 Examination report or reply
01.12.1998 Renewal fee
22.10.1998 Examination report or reply
03.06.1998 Examination report or reply
07.01.1998 Examination report or reply
28.11.1997 Renewal fee
10.10.1997 Examination report or reply
05.06.1997 Examination report or reply
14.03.1997 Change - divisional application(s) published on  02.05.1997 [1997/18]
19.02.1997 Examination report or reply
11.12.1996 Examination report or reply
28.11.1996 Renewal fee
02.08.1996 First examination report
31.07.1996 Examination report or reply
12.04.1996 Request for examination filed published on  29.05.1996 [1996/22]
26.09.1995 Publication of search report published on  15.11.1995 [1995/46]
22.09.1995 Change - classification published on  15.11.1995 [1995/46]
23.09.1994 Change - classification published on  17.11.1994 [1994/46]
22.04.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.06.1994 [1994/23]