Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0600718

EP0600718 - Secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawakami, Soichiro, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Mishina, Shinya, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Naoya, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/23]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date93309571.330.11.1993
[1994/23]
Priority number, dateJP1992032055730.11.1992         Original published format: JP 32055792
JP1992032055830.11.1992         Original published format: JP 32055892
JP1992032055930.11.1992         Original published format: JP 32055992
JP1992032056030.11.1992         Original published format: JP 32056092
JP1992034456324.12.1992         Original published format: JP 34456392
JP1993007834205.04.1993         Original published format: JP 7834293
[1994/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0600718
Date:08.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0600718
Date:15.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0600718
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/40, H01M10/24, H01M4/24, H01M4/02, H01M2/14, H01M4/36, H01M10/00, H01M4/58, H01M4/48
[1995/46]
Former International [1994/46]H01M10/40, H01M10/24, H01M4/24, H01M4/02, H01M2/14, H01M4/36, H01M10/00
Former International [1994/23]H01M10/40, H01M10/24, H01M4/24, H01M4/02, H01M2/14, H01M4/36
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1994/23]
TitleGerman:Sekundärbatterie[1999/26]
English:Secondary battery[1994/23]
French:Batterie secondaire[1994/23]
Former [1994/23]Sekundäre Batterie
MiscellaneousEPB 1997/18: Teilanmeldung 97200434.5 eingereicht am 14/02/97
EPB 1997/18: Divisional application 97200434.5 filed on 14/02/97
EPB 1997/18: Demande divisionnaire 97200434.5 déposée le 14/02/97
Examination procedure28.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/22]
05.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1999Fee for grant paid
27.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97200434.5  / EP0809314
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH26.04.2000
LI26.04.2000
[2002/02]
Documents cited:SearchJPH0428173  [ ] (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [X]DE3838329  (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1,11,12,16 * page 2, line 54 - line 56; figure 2; claims 1,4,6,8 * * page 7, line 62 - page 8, line 27 *;
 JPS63289759  [ ] (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 JPS62140358  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [X]EP0195684  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4-6,8,11-13,16,17,19 * page 3, paragraph 2; claims 1,3,7,9,10 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 4 *;
 JPH03289069  [ ] (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [X]JPS59873  ;
 [X]US5147739  (BEARD KIRBY W [US]) [X] 1,4,19,42,43,51,53,56 * column 3, line 16 - line 19; claim 19 * * column 4, line 53 - line 60 * * column 5, line 3 - line 19 * * column 5, line 3 - line 24; figure 1A; claims 1,7,8,14,15,24 *;
 JPH042065  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPS58197664  ;
 [X]DE2360026  (FORST) [X] 1,4,16,20 * page 2, line 4 - line 26 *;
 [A]JPS63308867  ;
 JPH04229562  [ ] (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 JPH03241675  [ ] (YAMAMOTO OSAMU);
 [XA]JPS5769677  ;
 [X]JPS567352  ;
 [X]JPS58165243  ;
 [X]GB2070847  (CELANESE CORP) [X] 31-33,36 * page 11, line 11 - line 32; claims 1,2,18,19 *;
 [XA]US4812375  (FOSTER DONALD L [US]) [X] 31,32,36,39 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 19; claims 1,2,9,21 * [A] 1,17,19,23;
 [X]EP0130049  (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 24,26-28,30 * page 34, line 2 - line 7; claims 1-4,32,36,40,43-45 * * page 35, line 20 - line 22 * * page 7, line 3 - line 14 * * page 9, line 29 - line 33 * * page 11, line 1 - line 13 *;
 [X]JPS58142771  ;
 [A]GB2024500  (EBAUCHES SA) [A] 24,26,30 * page 1, line 6 - line 14 * * page 1, line 66 - line 80 *;
 [A]US4326014  (DEY ARABINDA N) [A] 24,26,30 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]EP0517070  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [PX] 1,4-6,16,19,42,53 * column 1, line 19 - line 22; claims 1,4,5 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 55 - line 57 *;
 [E]EP0584987  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,4-8,12,13,16,17,20,22 * column 2, line 15 - line 25; claims 1-6,11 *;
 [X]FR2195846  (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [X] 42,43,49,52,57,67,69,77 * claims 1-3,6 * * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 3 * * page 8, line 3 - line 8 *;
 [X]JPS57126068  ;
 JPS61263069  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [X]US4684590  (SAMMELLS ANTHONY F [US]) [X] 42,49,53 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 67; figure 1; claims 1,5 *;
 [X]US3953241  (LANGER ALOIS, et al) [X] 42,43,48,49,54 * claims 5,6 *;
 [X]FR2584867  (INNOLAB [FR]) [X] 42,43,49,54 * page 2, line 1 - line 5; claim 3 * * page 3, line 6 - line 9 * * page 3, line 23 - paragraph 25 * * page 5, line 12 - line 15 *;
 [A]US4279978  (DODIN MARK G, et al) [A] 43 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]FR2298193  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 43 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]DE3117660  (BUSS DIETER H DR) [A] 43 * claims 1,6 *;
 JPH01239764  [ ] (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD, et al);
 JPH03263758  [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [X]EP0243653  (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 57,67-69,76 * page 27, line 2 * * page 29, paragraph L - page 31, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]US3625771  (ARRANCE FRANK C, et al) [X] 57,67-69,77 * column 8, line 58 - line 73; claims 1,9 * * abstract *;
 [X]JPS58137975  ;
 [A]JPH01319253  ;
 JPS61290662  [ ] (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [X]US4323480  (DINES MARTIN B, et al) [X] 72,79,82,84,93,95-100,102,104,108,110,116,117 * column 3, line 18 - line 36; claims 1,15,21 * * column 6, line 22 - line 26; examples 7,11 *;
 [X]DE3826281  (HAHN MEITNER KERNFORSCH [DE]) [X] 78 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 1; claims 1,11 *;
 [X]WO8402333  (NEVETT BRIAN ANTHONY, et al) [X] 78,79,82,84,87,90,91,93,95-98,102,116,120,121 * abstract *;
 [E]EP0571858  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1,4,16,19,78,79,82,83,87,90,91,93-99,101,116,120,121 * claims 1,4 * * page 5, line 5 - line 8 * * page 5, line 49 - line 56; examples 10,12 * * page 4, line 50 - line 52 *;
 [A]EP0394917  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 87,90,91,120,121 * page 3, line 18 - line 28 *;
 [A]US4567031  (RILEY BRIAN [US]) [A] 78,79,82,83,95-99,101,104,108,111,116,117 * column 1A, line 13 - line 17; claims 1,9,16 *;
 [PA]US5180574  (VON SACKEN ULRICH [CA]) [PA] 80 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - NANBA MASARU ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous batteries with covered anodes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920629), vol. 116, no. 26, Database accession no. 259054, [X] 1,4-6,8,9,12,16,19,31,32,35-37,39 * abstract *
 [X]  - MIZUMOTO MAMORU ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous batteries with coated anodes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890403), vol. 110, no. 14, Database accession no. 118380, [X] 1,4-6,12,16,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - KOSHINA HIDE ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870921), vol. 107, no. 12, Database accession no. 99798, [X] 1,4-6,8-10,16,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - FURUKAWA SANEHIRO ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920518), vol. 116, no. 20, Database accession no. 197706c, [X] 1,4,5,16,19,31,32,35,37 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840413), vol. 008, no. 081, Database accession no. (E - 238), [X] 1,4,5,10,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - KOSHINA HIDE ET AL, "Nonaqueous electrolyte secondary batteries and their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920601), vol. 116, no. 22, Database accession no. 218168w, [A] 31,32,35-39 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840221), vol. 8, no. 39, Database accession no. (E - 228), [A] 31,32,35,37 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890411), vol. 13, no. 147, Database accession no. (E - 741), [A] 1,4,11,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - NAKANE IKURO ET AL, "Secondary lithium batteries with nonaqueous electrolyte", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930111), vol. 118, no. 2, Database accession no. 9423c, [X] 19,31-33,35,37 * abstract *
 [X]  - YAMAMOTO OSAMU ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous lithium batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920323), vol. 116, no. 12, Database accession no. 110107m, [X] 1,4,19,31-33,35,37 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820806), vol. 6, no. 147, Database accession no. (E - 123), [X] 31-33,35-37 * abstract * [A] 41
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810416), vol. 5, no. 55, Database accession no. (E - 052), [X] 31-33,36 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831222), vol. 7, no. 288, Database accession no. (E - 218), [X] 31-33,36,39 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831117), vol. 7, no. 258, Database accession no. (E - 211)<1403> , [X] 24,27,30 * abstract *
 [X]  - J. G. THEVENIN ET AL, "Study of the Li/Li3N electrode in an Organic Electrolyte", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, vol. 134, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1149/1.2100266, pages 2650 - 2656, XP000034800 [X] 24,26,28,30 * page 2650, paragraph 1 * * page 2651, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2100266
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821106), vol. 006, no. 222, Database accession no. (E - 140), [X] 42,43,48,49,54 * abstract *
 [X]  - R. VIGNAUD, "Performances et applications des générateurs zinc-air et zinc-oxygène réversibles", REVUE GENERALE DE L'ELECTRICITE, PARIS FR, vol. 84, no. 6, pages 481 - 484, XP002067672 [X] 42,43,49,54 * page 484, column L, line 45 - line 48 *
 [X]  - MIZUNO ET AL, "Secondary nonaqueous batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870605), vol. 106, no. 24, Database accession no. 199239, [X] 1,3,4,15,19,31,32,35,36,42,53,56 * abstract *
 [X]  - ISHITANI ET AL, "Paste-type cathodes for secondary alkaline batteries and their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900528), vol. 112, no. 22, Database accession no. 202095, [X] 57,58,60 * abstract *
 [X]  - YOSHINO AKIRA ET AL, "Batteries with increased safety", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920420), vol. 116, no. 16, Database accession no. 155465, [X] 57,76 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831108), vol. 7, no. 251, Database accession no. (E - 209), [X] 57,76 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900308), vol. 14, no. 125, Database accession no. (E - 900), [A] 57,76 * abstract *
 [A]  - UBUKAWA ET AL, "Nonaqueous batteries", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870810), vol. 107, no. 6, Database accession no. 43148, [A] 57,76 * abstract *
 [X]  - KIKKAWA SHINICI, "New materials for advanced lithium battery - especially on plasma-assisted CVD of titanium(IV)sulfide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19891016), vol. 111, no. 16, Database accession no. 137458, [X] 78,79,82,84,93,95-100,102,105,108,113,116 * abstract *
    [] - MEM. INST. SCI. IND. RES., vol. 46, pages 63 - 70,
 [X]  - JOHNSON D. R. ET AL, "TEM studies of lithium intercalation in the solid-state battery cathode, titanium disulfide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860602), vol. 104, no. 22, Database accession no. 189696, [X] 78,79,83,97,98,100,101 * abstract *
    [] - INST. PHYS. CONF. SER. VOLUME DATE 1985, vol. 78, pages 325 - 8,