Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0601836

EP0601836 - Silver halide light sensitive color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2001 [2001/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Former [1994/24]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kita, Hiroshi, c/o Konica Corporation
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sato, Hirokazu, c/o Konica Corporation
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1994/24]
Representative(s)Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/24]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date93309829.507.12.1993
[1994/24]
Priority number, dateJP1992032682607.12.1992         Original published format: JP 32682692
[1994/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0601836
Date:15.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0601836
Date:12.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0601836
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/392, G03C7/388
[1995/15]
Former International [1994/24]G03C7/392
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/24]
TitleGerman:Farbphotographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial[1994/24]
English:Silver halide light sensitive color photographic material[1994/24]
French:Produit photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière[1994/24]
Examination procedure04.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/48]
23.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2000Fee for grant paid
03.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0167762  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]US4970139  (BAGCHI PRANAB [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 7 - column 28; claim - *;
 JPS88125936  [ ] (KONICA CO.;JAPAN);
 [A]EP0137273  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0293190  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0019800  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]FR2150505  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * claim - *
 [A]  - Sakuma H et al, "Silver halide photogaphic material having improved antistatic property by combination of poly(oxyethylene) compd. and polyvalent alcohol", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890403), vol. 110, no. 14, Database accession no. 125253, [A] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantJPS4831256
 JPS4831625
 JPS5130462
 JPS49134326
 JPS49134327
 US3069262
 US2360290
 US4015990
 JPS5227534
 JPS5214751
 US2735765
 US3432300
 US3574627
 US3573050
 JPS4920977
 GB1451000
 JPS5087649