blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0657700 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0657700



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 135
02.05.2001 Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification Search / examination 1
23.11.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
14.10.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.10.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
10.08.2000 Description Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
04.08.2000 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
09.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
16.03.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.03.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.03.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.03.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 6
21.12.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
27.11.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.11.1998 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
31.08.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
31.08.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
18.08.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
13.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.04.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.04.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.04.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.12.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
08.04.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.04.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.02.1997 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.01.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.02.1996 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.09.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.04.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.04.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
03.02.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.02.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
03.02.1994 Description Search / examination 7
03.02.1994 Drawings Search / examination 2
28.12.1993 Drawings Search / examination 4
28.12.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.12.1993 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.12.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.12.1993 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
07.12.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7