blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0657700


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
04.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2003  [2003/08]
30.08.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
08.03.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
23.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
11.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
02.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
02.02.2001 Correction of patent specification published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
26.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2001 [2001/11]
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
23.02.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
23.02.2000 Renewal fee
03.02.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.12.1998 Renewal fee
03.12.1998 Communication of intention to grant
03.12.1998 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.08.1998 Communication of intention to grant
17.06.1998 Examination report or reply
21.04.1998 Examination report or reply
19.12.1997 Renewal fee
09.12.1997 Examination report or reply
09.05.1997 Renewal fee
12.04.1997 Examination report or reply
22.01.1997 Examination report or reply
20.09.1996 First examination report
17.09.1996 Examination report or reply
10.04.1996 Renewal fee
14.10.1995 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.1995 [1995/49]
28.04.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.06.1995 [1995/24]