blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0657700
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0657700Global Dossier 21.03.2001B9
EP0657700 19.04.2000B1
EP0657700 14.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
EP93309841 07.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT191968T 15.05.2000T
Priority number Date
EP93309841 07.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69328431D 25.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP93309841 07.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69328431T 21.12.2000T2
Priority number Date
EP93309841 07.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2148209T 16.10.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP93309841 07.12.1993