Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0657700

EP0657700 - Improvements in water heating and space heating apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCOTTISH POWER PLC
Energy Supply Division Cathcart Business Park Spean Street Glasgow
Scotland G44 4BE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
SCOTTISH POWER PLC
Energy Supply Division Cathcart Business Park Spean Street
Glasgow Scotland G44 4BE / GB
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
SCOTTISH POWER PLC
154 Montrose Crescent
Hamilton ML3 6LL, Scotland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Whyte, David B.
c/o SCOTTISH POWER PLC, 154 Montrose Crescent
Hamilton ML3 6LL, Scotland / GB
[1995/24]
Representative(s)Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date93309841.007.12.1993
[1995/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0657700
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0657700
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0657700
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.1994
ClassificationInternational:F24D11/00
[1995/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung für Wassererhitzung und Raumheizung[1995/24]
English:Improvements in water heating and space heating apparatus and methods[1995/24]
French:Méthode et appareil pour chauffer de l'eau et des espaces[1995/24]
Examination procedure06.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
23.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.1999Fee for grant paid
03.03.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199503   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1996
31.12.199604   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1997
31.12.199907   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
LU07.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2002/42]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2002/17]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE07.12.2000
Former [2002/02]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
Former [2001/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
Former [2001/16]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
Former [2001/11]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[XD]GB2253268  (HEPBURN GEORGE) [XD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2131526  (WHITE GEOFFREY) [A] 5,9,10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4860907
 US4487324
 US4506795