Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0605973

EP0605973 - Augmenting a lexical transducer by analogy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1994/28]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Karttunen, Lauri J.
3950 Jefferson Avenue
Redwood City, California 94062 / US
[1994/28]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]Rackham, Stephen Neil , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1997/12]Reynolds, Julian David
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Former [1997/06]Hill, Cecilia Ann
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Former [1994/28]Hill, Cecilia Ann
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date93310056.214.12.1993
[1994/28]
Priority number, dateUS1992099973631.12.1992         Original published format: US 999736
[1994/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0605973
Date:13.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0605973
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.04.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/20, G06F17/30
[2000/29]
Former International [1994/28]G06F15/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/28]
TitleGerman:Ergänzung eines lexikalen Umwandlers durch Analogie[1994/28]
English:Augmenting a lexical transducer by analogy[1994/28]
French:Accroissement d'un transducteur lexical par analogie[1994/28]
Examination procedure13.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/11]
11.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2000Fee for grant paid
28.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0282721  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 4 - line 37 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 13; claim - *;
 [A]EP0378848  (IBM [US]) [A] 4 * page 5, line 40 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 16 - line 47 *
 [A]  C. WELLS ET AL, "Fast Dictionary Look-Up for Contextual Word Recognition", PATTERN RECOGNITION, OXFORD, GB, (1990), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 501 - 508, XP000137926 [A] 1-4 * page 502, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 503, column R, paragraph 2 - page 505, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(90)90071-R
 [A]  J. HARDWICKE ET AL, "Parallel Access to an English Dictionary", MICROPROCESSORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, LONDON GB, (199107), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 291 - 298, XP000228734 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-9331(91)90107-Q
Examination   K.KOSKENNIEMI, "A General Computational Model for Word-Form Recognition and production", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS (COLING 84), MORRISTOWN, US, (19840702), pages 178 - 181,