EP0564348 - Frame-supported pellicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashida, Meguru 3562-2, Annaka Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Yoshihiro 12-5, Kitakubo-machi Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Hamada, Yuichi D-405, 3-13-37, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [1997/31] |
Former [1993/40] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400809.5 | 29.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | JP19920108499 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10849992 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564348 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564348 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
G03F1/62 (EP);
C09J7/401 (EP);
C09J2427/005 (EP);
C09J2483/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | G03F1/14, B32B7/06, C08L83/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/40] | Title | German: | Rahmen-gestützte Membrane | [1993/40] | English: | Frame-supported pellicle | [1993/40] | French: | Opercule pelliculaire supporté par un châssis | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0469928 ; | [X]US4171397 ; | [X]US5073422 ; | [X]EP0378420 ; | [A]EP0438602 |