blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581650

EP0581650 - Improvements to apparatus for flanging containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.1997
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reynolds Metals Company
Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond
Virginia 23230-1701 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY
Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street
Richmond, Virginia 23230-1701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Harry W.
7901 Whittington Drive
Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US
02 / Jensen, Eric J.
2719 Gainford Circle
Richmond, Virginia 23234 / US
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Orès, Bernard, et al
Cabinet ORES
36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]Orès, Bernard, et al
Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date93401897.922.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateUS1992092116629.07.1992         Original published format: US 921166
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0581650
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581650
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1993
ClassificationIPC:B21D51/26, B21D19/04
[1994/05]
CPC:
B21D51/2615 (EP,US); B21D19/046 (EP,KR,US); B21D19/12 (KR);
B21D37/04 (KR); B21D51/263 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen an Vorrichtungen zum Formen von Flanschen an Dosen[1994/05]
English:Improvements to apparatus for flanging containers[1994/05]
French:Amélioration aux appareils de formation des colerettes aux boîtes[1994/05]
Examination procedure11.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
14.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.1996Fee for grant paid
13.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.06.1996
CH12.06.1996
ES12.06.1996
GR12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
LI12.06.1996
[2008/05]
Former [2002/26]AT12.06.1996
CH12.06.1996
ES12.06.1996
GR12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
LI12.06.1996
Former [2000/52]AT12.06.1996
CH12.06.1996
GR12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
LI12.06.1996
Former [2000/50]AT12.06.1996
GR12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
CH17.09.1996
LI17.09.1996
Former [2000/05]AT12.06.1996
GR12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
Former [1999/42]AT12.06.1996
IT12.06.1996
Former [1997/03]AT12.06.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]US5121621  (IHLY EUGEN F [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.