Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0633008

EP0633008 - Cryotherapy device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.1999
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.1999 [1999/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRYONIC MEDICAL
Le Martinet du Haut
39110 Salins Les Bains / FR
[1997/52]
Former [1995/02]For all designated states
CRYONIC MEDICAL
9, rue d'Andlau
F-67800 Hoenheim / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Cluzeau, Christian
24, rue Fischart
67000 Strasbourg / FR
[1998/21]
Former [1995/02]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Puiroux, Guy , et al
Cabinet Guiu & Bruder
10, rue Paul Thénard
21000 Dijon / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]Puiroux, Guy , et al
Cabinet Claude Guiu, 10, rue Paul Thénard
21000 Dijon / FR
Former [1997/17]Littolff, Denis , et al
Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Former [1995/02]Bossard, Jacques-René
Meyer & Partenaires Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Bureaux Europe 20, place des Halles
F-67000 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date93440053.206.07.1993
[1995/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0633008
Date:11.01.1995
Language:FR
[1995/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0633008
Date:20.05.1998
Language:FR
[1998/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/00, F25D3/10, F17C9/02
[1995/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/02]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung für die Kryotherapie[1995/02]
English:Cryotherapy device[1995/02]
French:Appareillage de cryothérapie[1995/02]
Examination procedure02.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/13]
01.07.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.11.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.1998Fee for grant paid
02.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.02.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:20.12.1997
[1998/38]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE8519992U  ;
 [A]DE3702807  ;
 [A]GB2042148  ;
 [A]EP0256730