Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0591085

EP0591085 - Gas purge system for isolation enclosure for contamination sensitive items [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.1996
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.1996Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.1996 [1996/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/14]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DeAngelis, Robert Louis
543 Revere Drive
Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US
02 / Gallagher, Gary Michael
39 Fieldstone Boulevard
Wappingers Falls, New York 12590 / US
[1994/14]
Representative(s)Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1994/14]Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date93480129.110.09.1993
[1994/14]
Priority number, dateUS1992094995924.09.1992         Original published format: US 949959
[1994/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0591085
Date:06.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, H01L21/68
[1994/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/14]
TitleGerman:Gasabführsystem für eine Schutzeinrichtung für schmutzempfindliche Gegenstände[1994/14]
English:Gas purge system for isolation enclosure for contamination sensitive items[1994/14]
French:Système de purge de gaz pour enceintes isolées d'objets sensibles à la contamination[1994/14]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure18.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
03.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4674939  ;
 [A]EP0242615  ;
 [A]GB2048425