Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0580537 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0580537



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 276
06.02.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
06.02.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
05.02.2002 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
21.01.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
18.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.09.2000 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
30.06.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.06.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 6
23.06.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
25.02.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.02.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.02.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
14.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
14.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
14.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
14.02.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
17.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.12.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.12.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
16.10.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.10.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.10.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
14.10.1999 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
14.10.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
14.10.1999 Means of redress Opposition 1
14.10.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.08.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
19.08.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
25.06.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.06.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.06.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.06.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.06.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.06.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.06.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
07.06.1999 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.06.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
07.06.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.05.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.05.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.05.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.04.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
27.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.01.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
10.12.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.12.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
25.06.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.06.1998 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.06.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.05.1998 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
10.07.1997 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.06.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
27.05.1997 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 4
26.02.1997 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.02.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.02.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.02.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
11.02.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.02.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.10.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
27.09.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.01.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
27.04.1995 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
23.01.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.01.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
12.02.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.1993 Description Search / examination 5
21.01.1993 Description Search / examination 7
21.01.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.01.1993 Priority document Search / examination 28
21.01.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5