Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0616091

EP0616091 - Building blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/38]Cement blocks for masonry walls to buildings
[1999/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kamoudis, Konstantinos
Georgiou Christoforoustreet, No. 7, Akropolis
Nicosia 149 / CY
[1994/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/38]
Representative(s)Dacoronia, Eugenia G.
312, Patission Street
111 41 Athens / GR
[N/P]
Former [1994/38]Dacoronia, Eugenia G.
312, Patission Street
GR-111 41 Athens / GR
Application number, filing date93600014.026.07.1993
[1994/38]
Priority number, dateGR1992001035304.08.1992         Original published format: GR 92010353
[1994/38]
Filing languageEL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0616091
Date:21.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0616091
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/26
[1994/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1994/38]
TitleGerman:Bausteine[1999/48]
English:Building blocks[1999/48]
French:Blocs de construction[1999/48]
Former [1994/38]Zementblöcke für Gebäudemauern
Former [1994/38]Cement blocks for masonry walls to buildings
Former [1994/38]Eléments de construction en ciment pour parois de bâtiments
Examination procedure01.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/49]
19.10.1995Request for accelerated examination filed
05.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.1996Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
17.08.199503   M02   Fee paid on   20.09.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES29.03.2000
FR29.03.2000
SE29.03.2000
DE30.06.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/26]ES29.03.2000
SE29.03.2000
DE30.06.2000
FR25.08.2000
Former [2002/23]SE29.03.2000
DE30.06.2000
FR25.08.2000
Former [2002/13]DE30.06.2000
FR25.08.2000
Former [2001/16]FR25.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]WO7900198  (PARRY & HUGHES [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 32; figures 4,5,8 *;
 [A]WO9209762  (BRANDOM [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]FR2562932  (HUMBERT BERNARD [FR]) [X] 9 * the whole document *