Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0658996

EP0658996 - Method and apparatus to secure the information of a data packet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Metering AG
Feldstrasse 1
6300 Zug / CH
[2000/19]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
6301 Zug / CH
Former [1995/25]For all designated states
Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG
CH-6301 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Schaub, Thomas
Moosstrasse 16
CH-6330 Cham / CH
[1995/25]
Application number, filing date93810875.014.12.1993
[1995/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0658996
Date:21.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0658996
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/06
[1995/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Sichern der Information eines Datenpaketes[1995/25]
English:Method and apparatus to secure the information of a data packet[1995/25]
French:Procédé et appareil de sécurisation d'information d'un paquet de données[1995/25]
Examination procedure21.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1999Fee for grant paid
12.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
GR22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
AT14.12.2000
LU14.12.2000
[2005/23]
Former [2004/07]ES22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
GR22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
AT14.12.2000
Former [2003/09]ES22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
AT14.12.2000
Former [2002/26]ES22.03.2000
GB22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/50]GB22.03.2000
IE22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/12]GB22.03.2000
PT23.06.2000
Former [2001/09]PT23.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0422757  (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  DIFFIE & HELLMAN, "Exhaustive Cryptoanalysis of the NBS Data Encryption Standard", COMPUTER, LONG BEACH US, (197706), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 74 - 84, [A] 1,2,6 * page 80, column L, line 9 - page 81, column L, line 35; figures 1,A,B *
 [A]  MASSEY ET AL, "A Self-Synchronizing Digital Scrambler for Cryptographic Protection of Data", 1984 INTERNATIONAL ZÜRICH SEMINAR ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, NY,USA, (198403), pages 163 - 169, [A] 1,2,6 * page 165, column L, line 18 - line 36; figures 2.2,2.3 *