Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0656430

EP0656430 - Process and apparatus for the codeposition of metallic oxides on plastic films. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  26.11.1999
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Galileo Vacuum Systems S.R.L.
Via delle Fonti 432
59100 Prato / IT
[1998/38]
Former [1995/23]For all designated states
GALILEO VACUUM TEC S.p.A.
Via Albert Einstein, 35
I-50013 Campi Bisenzio (FI) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Fusi, Andrea
Via di Bellariva n.20
I-50136 Firenze / IT
[1995/23]
Representative(s)Mannucci, Gianfranco
Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci
Via della Scala 4
50123 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/23]Mannucci, Gianfranco, Dott.-Ing.
Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4
I-50123 Firenze / IT
Application number, filing date93830451.609.11.1993
[1995/23]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0656430
Date:07.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0656430
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0656430
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.1994
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/10, C23C14/54, C23C14/56, B65D65/40
[1995/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen Beschichtung von Kunststoffsubstraten mit Metalloxyden[1997/11]
English:Process and apparatus for the codeposition of metallic oxides on plastic films.[1995/23]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la codéposition des oxydes métalliques sur film plastiques[1995/23]
Former [1995/23]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zusammenbeschichtung von Kunststoffsubstraten mit Metalloxyde
Examination procedure07.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/23]
29.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.12.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1996Fee for grant paid
12.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.1997   
Alusuisse Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Opponent's representative
Wiedmer, Edwin
Patentanwälte
Breiter + Wiedmer AG
Seuzachstrasse 2
Postfach 366
8413 Neftenbach / CH
 [N/P]
Former [1997/51]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.1997   
Alusuisse Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Opponent's representative
Wiedmer, Edwin
Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG, Seuzachstrasse 2, Postfach 366
8413 Neftenbach / CH
20.01.1998Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.05.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
20.04.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.08.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.11.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.03.1997
[2006/14]
Former [1998/03]FR08.08.1997
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0460796  (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 49 * [A] 11-15 [Y] 4,6;
 [XAY]EP0549528  (ALISUISSE-LONZA SERVICES AG) [X] 12-15 * claims 12,14 * [A] 1-3,5-11 [Y] 4;
 [XA]DE4113221  (LEYBOLD AG) [X] 12-14 * claims 1-4 * [A] 1-11,15;
 [YA]GB2119970  (CLARION CO LTD) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 40 - line 78 * [A] 1-5,7-15;
 [A]DE1278194  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 15 - line 32 *
ExaminationUS5107791