Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0632877

EP0632877 - SELF-COOLING FLUID CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENVIROCHILL INTERNATIONAL LTD
Chancery House, High Street
Bridgetown / BB
[1995/02]
Inventor(s)01 / AITCHISON, Gary, Reid
2886 Arvida Circle
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 1R5 / CA
02 / HETHERINGTON, Michael, Warnett
R.R. 1
Mount Albert, Ontario L0G 1M0 / CA
[1995/02]
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/02]Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date93901073.215.01.1993
[1995/02]
WO1993BB00001
Priority number, dateUS1992082746429.01.1992         Original published format: US 827464
[1995/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9315960
Date:19.08.1993
[1993/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0632877
Date:11.01.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993
[1995/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0632877
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.11.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:F25D3/10
[1995/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/02]
TitleGerman:SELBSTKÜHLENDER FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER[1995/02]
English:SELF-COOLING FLUID CONTAINER[1995/02]
French:RECIPIENT A REFROIDISSEMENT AUTONOME POUR LIQUIDES[1995/02]
Entry into regional phase18.08.1994National basic fee paid 
18.08.1994Search fee paid 
18.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.08.1994Examination requested  [1995/02]
08.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
23.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.02.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
10.02.2000Fee for grant paid
10.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37]
Request for further processing for:10.02.2000Request for further processing filed
10.02.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.02.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199806   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.1998
31.01.200008   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0279971  (HUANG KIN SHEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 20 - line 43; figure 4 *;
 [X]US2082381  (CHAMBERLAIN JAMES M W) [X] 1,3,6,7 * page 1, column R, line 38 - page 4, column L, line 51; figures 1,5,9 *
International search[XP]US5201183  (RAMOS JOHN F [AU]);
 [A]US4993237  (BOND JAMES R [CA], et al);
 [A]US4993236  (WILSON JOHN J [US]);
 [X]US4941328  (SHEU LAI-FA [TW]);
 [A]US4925470  (CHOU TIEN-FA [TW]);
 [A]US4791789  (WILSON JOHN J [US]);
 [A]US4688395  (HOLCOMB ROBERT R [US]);
 [A]US4669273  (FISCHER VICTOR H [US], et al);
 [X]US4656838  (SHEN HWANG K [TW]);
 [X]US4584848  (BARNETT EUGENE R [US]);
 [A]US2881321  (DAUKSHER WALTER J, et al);
 [X]US3852975  (BECK W);
 [A]US3759060  (CHASE H);
 [X]US3696633  (MILLS EVAN D);
 [X]US3494142  (BECK WILLIAM D);
 [XY]US3417573  (WARNER JOHN M);
 [Y]US3338067  ;
 [XY]US3257821  (WARNER JOHN M);
 [Y]US2898747  (WALES NATHANIEL B);
 [X]FR513015  (THEODORE DORY STERNE [FR]);
 [X]JPS523758  (KAWABATA TAMOTSU)