Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0625341

EP0625341 - DEVICE FOR TREATING PATIENTS WITH DISTURBANCES OF POSE AND MOTOR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2000
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ZAKRYTOGO TIPA "AJURVEDA"
Litovsky Bulvar, 5/10-275
Moscow, 117593 / RU
[1999/48]
Former [1994/47]For all designated states
AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ZAKRYTOGO TIPA "AJUVERDA"
Litovsky Bulvar, 5/10-275
Moscow, 117593 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / AFANASENKO, Nikolai Ivanovich
pr. Svobodny, 7-1-77
Moscow, 111587 / RU
02 / BARER, Arnold Semenovich
pr. Mira, 184-2-299
Moscow, 129301 / RU
03 / GRIGORIEV, Anatoly Ivanovich
ul. A. Nevskogo, 1-V-47
Moscow, 125047 / RU
04 / KOZLOVSKAYA, Inesa Benediktovna
ul. Kalyaevskaya, 5-287
Moscow, 103006 / RU
05 / SAVINOV, Albert Pavlovich ul. Pionerskaya, 19-8
Moskovskaya obl.
pos. Tomilino, 140070 / RU
06 / SEVERIN, Gai Iliich
pr. Universitetsky, 5-460
Moscow, 117296 / RU
07 / SEMENOVA, Xenia Alexandrovna
ul. Druzhby, 2/19-54
Moscow, 117330 / RU
08 / SINIGIN, Viktor Mikhailovich
ul. Pionerskaya, 24-63
Moskovskaya obl. pos. Tomilino, 140070 / RU
09 / SOKOLOVSKY, Igor Antonovich ul. Gogolya, 48-66
Moskovskaya obl.
pos. Tomilino, 140070 / RU
10 / TIKHOMIROV, Evgeny Petrovich
Nagatinskaya nab., 40/1-634
Moscow, 115470 / RU
[1994/47]
Representative(s)Hano, Christian , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/47]Hano, Christian , et al
von Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Patentanwälte, Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date93902594.618.12.1992
[1994/47]
WO1992RU00247
Priority number, dateRU1950002564731.01.1992         Original published format: RU 5025647
[1994/47]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9315706
Date:19.08.1993
[1993/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0625341
Date:23.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0625341
Date:01.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SU21.07.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/01, A63B21/055
[1994/49]
Former International [1994/47]A61F5/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/47]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT PROBLEMEN DER HALTUNG SOWIE DER MOTORISCHEN AKTIVITÄTEN[1994/47]
English:DEVICE FOR TREATING PATIENTS WITH DISTURBANCES OF POSE AND MOTOR ACTIVITY[1994/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PATIENTS PRESENTANT DES TROUBLES D'ATTITUDE ET D'ACTIVITE MOTRICE[1999/11]
Former [1994/47]DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PATIENTS PRESENTANT DES TROUBLES DE L'ATTITUDE ET DE L'ACTIVITE MOTRICE
Entry into regional phase21.03.1994Translation filed 
21.03.1994National basic fee paid 
21.03.1994Search fee paid 
21.03.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
21.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/47]
27.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1999Fee for grant paid
27.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR01.12.1999
[2008/24]
Documents cited:Search[X]FR480383  (ROBIN) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2772674  (EDWARD SWIECH, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 3 - line 65; figure - *
International search[A]FR2120500
 [A]FR2298314
 [A]FR2390152
 [A]EP0066028
 [A]SU1528483
 [A]SU1556675